Senate | 04/24/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1481 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1481 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1375 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1772 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Record vote | RV#223 | Journal Page: 1683 |
House | 04/22/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1683 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1683 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1669 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1669 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1275 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 488 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Filed |