81R2263 CAE-D By: Villarreal H.B. No. 136 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to providing notification to parents of eligible children of the availability of prekindergarten classes. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 29, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 29.1534 to read as follows: Sec. 29.1534. NOTIFICATION OF PREKINDERGARTEN CLASSES. (a) The agency shall develop joint strategies with other state agencies regarding methods to increase community awareness of prekindergarten programs through programs that provide information relating to public assistance programs. (b) Each school district shall report annually to the agency the strategies implemented by the school district to increase community awareness of prekindergarten programs offered by the district. The district shall report the information on a form prescribed by the commissioner. (c) Not later than January 1, 2010, the agency shall conduct a study to identify effective methods to communicate to the parent of an eligible child the availability of prekindergarten classes. The study must include research on providing information regarding prekindergarten classes through public, private, and nonprofit institutions that provide assistance and support to families with children eligible for prekindergarten classes. Not later than February 1, 2010, the agency shall make recommendations to school districts based on the study regarding the most effective methods to increase communication regarding the availability of prekindergarten classes. This subsection expires March 1, 2010. (d) Not later than December 1, 2010, the agency shall prepare and deliver to the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the presiding officer of each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over primary and secondary education a report detailing strategies developed under Subsection (a) to increase community awareness of prekindergarten programs. This subsection expires January 1, 2011. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009.