1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 136 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to providing notification to parents of eligible children |
---|
6 | 6 | | of the availability of prekindergarten programs. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 29, Education Code, is |
---|
9 | 9 | | amended by adding Section 29.1534 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | Sec. 29.1534. NOTIFICATION OF PREKINDERGARTEN PROGRAMS. |
---|
11 | 11 | | (a) In this section, "prekindergarten program" includes |
---|
12 | 12 | | prekindergarten programs provided by a private entity through a |
---|
13 | 13 | | partnership with the school district. |
---|
14 | 14 | | (b) The agency shall develop joint strategies with other |
---|
15 | 15 | | state agencies regarding methods to increase community awareness of |
---|
16 | 16 | | prekindergarten programs through programs that provide information |
---|
17 | 17 | | relating to public assistance programs. |
---|
18 | 18 | | (c) The agency may develop outreach materials for use by |
---|
19 | 19 | | school districts to increase community awareness of |
---|
20 | 20 | | prekindergarten programs. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (d) Each school district shall report annually to the agency |
---|
22 | 22 | | the strategies implemented by the school district to increase |
---|
23 | 23 | | community awareness of prekindergarten programs offered by the |
---|
24 | 24 | | district. The district shall report the information on a form |
---|
25 | 25 | | prescribed by the commissioner. A report required by this |
---|
26 | 26 | | subsection may be combined, at the discretion of the commissioner, |
---|
27 | 27 | | with another report that the district submits to the agency. Not |
---|
28 | 28 | | later than the 90th day after the date the agency receives a report |
---|
29 | 29 | | from a school district as required by this subsection, the agency |
---|
30 | 30 | | shall post the report on the agency's Internet website. This |
---|
31 | 31 | | subsection expires September 1, 2013. |
---|
32 | 32 | | (e) The agency shall provide information to school |
---|
33 | 33 | | districts regarding effective methods to communicate to the parent |
---|
34 | 34 | | of an eligible child the availability of prekindergarten programs, |
---|
35 | 35 | | including information regarding prekindergarten programs through |
---|
36 | 36 | | public, private, and nonprofit institutions that provide |
---|
37 | 37 | | assistance and support to families with children eligible for |
---|
38 | 38 | | prekindergarten programs. |
---|
39 | 39 | | (f) Not later than December 1, 2010, the agency shall |
---|
40 | 40 | | prepare and deliver to the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the |
---|
41 | 41 | | house of representatives, and the presiding officer of each |
---|
42 | 42 | | legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over |
---|
43 | 43 | | primary and secondary education a report detailing strategies |
---|
44 | 44 | | developed under Subsection (b) to increase community awareness of |
---|
45 | 45 | | prekindergarten programs. This subsection expires January 1, 2011. |
---|
46 | 46 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
47 | 47 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
48 | 48 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
49 | 49 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
50 | 50 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
51 | 51 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
52 | 52 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
53 | 53 | | I certify that H.B. No. 136 was passed by the House on May 7, |
---|
54 | 54 | | 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 78, Nays 63, 1 present, not |
---|
55 | 55 | | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
56 | 56 | | No. 136 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 93, Nays 50, 2 |
---|
57 | 57 | | present, not voting. |
---|
58 | 58 | | ______________________________ |
---|
59 | 59 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
60 | 60 | | I certify that H.B. No. 136 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
61 | 61 | | amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
62 | 62 | | 0. |
---|
63 | 63 | | ______________________________ |
---|
64 | 64 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
65 | 65 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
66 | 66 | | Date |
---|
67 | 67 | | __________________ |
---|
68 | 68 | | Governor |
---|