H.B. No. 136 AN ACT relating to providing notification to parents of eligible children of the availability of prekindergarten programs. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 29, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 29.1534 to read as follows: Sec. 29.1534. NOTIFICATION OF PREKINDERGARTEN PROGRAMS. (a) In this section, "prekindergarten program" includes prekindergarten programs provided by a private entity through a partnership with the school district. (b) The agency shall develop joint strategies with other state agencies regarding methods to increase community awareness of prekindergarten programs through programs that provide information relating to public assistance programs. (c) The agency may develop outreach materials for use by school districts to increase community awareness of prekindergarten programs. (d) Each school district shall report annually to the agency the strategies implemented by the school district to increase community awareness of prekindergarten programs offered by the district. The district shall report the information on a form prescribed by the commissioner. A report required by this subsection may be combined, at the discretion of the commissioner, with another report that the district submits to the agency. Not later than the 90th day after the date the agency receives a report from a school district as required by this subsection, the agency shall post the report on the agency's Internet website. This subsection expires September 1, 2013. (e) The agency shall provide information to school districts regarding effective methods to communicate to the parent of an eligible child the availability of prekindergarten programs, including information regarding prekindergarten programs through public, private, and nonprofit institutions that provide assistance and support to families with children eligible for prekindergarten programs. (f) Not later than December 1, 2010, the agency shall prepare and deliver to the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the presiding officer of each legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over primary and secondary education a report detailing strategies developed under Subsection (b) to increase community awareness of prekindergarten programs. This subsection expires January 1, 2011. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 136 was passed by the House on May 7, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 78, Nays 63, 1 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 136 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 93, Nays 50, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 136 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor