1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 1363 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the diabetes mellitus registry pilot program. |
---|
6 | 6 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 7 | | SECTION 1. Section 1, Chapter 706 (H.B. 2132), Acts of the |
---|
8 | 8 | | 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is amended by amending |
---|
9 | 9 | | Subsections (c), (d), and (e) and adding Subsections (d-1) and (g) |
---|
10 | 10 | | to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | (c) The department shall select to participate in the pilot |
---|
12 | 12 | | program a public health district that serves a county with a |
---|
13 | 13 | | population of less than two million and contains a municipality |
---|
14 | 14 | | with a population of over one million. The department and the |
---|
15 | 15 | | public health district shall create an electronic registry to track |
---|
16 | 16 | | the glycosylated hemoglobin level and the diagnosis codes of each |
---|
17 | 17 | | person who has a laboratory test to determine that level performed |
---|
18 | 18 | | at a clinical laboratory in the district. |
---|
19 | 19 | | (d) Except as provided by Subsection (d-1), a physician |
---|
20 | 20 | | practicing in the participating public health district who, on or |
---|
21 | 21 | | after November 1, 2009, orders a glycosylated hemoglobin test for a |
---|
22 | 22 | | patient shall submit to the clinical laboratory the diagnosis codes |
---|
23 | 23 | | of a patient along with the patient's sample. A clinical laboratory |
---|
24 | 24 | | located in the participating public health district shall submit to |
---|
25 | 25 | | the district and the department for a patient whose diagnosis codes |
---|
26 | 26 | | were submitted with the patient's sample the results of the |
---|
27 | 27 | | patient's [each] glycosylated hemoglobin test along with the |
---|
28 | 28 | | diagnosis codes provided by the physician for that patient [that |
---|
29 | 29 | | the laboratory performs]. |
---|
30 | 30 | | (d-1) A physician who orders a glycosylated hemoglobin test |
---|
31 | 31 | | for a patient must provide the patient with a form developed by the |
---|
32 | 32 | | department that allows the patient to opt out of having the |
---|
33 | 33 | | patient's information included in the registry. If the patient |
---|
34 | 34 | | opts out by signing the form, the physician: |
---|
35 | 35 | | (1) shall keep the form in the patient's medical |
---|
36 | 36 | | records; and |
---|
37 | 37 | | (2) may not submit to the clinical laboratory the |
---|
38 | 38 | | patient's diagnosis codes along with the patient's sample. |
---|
39 | 39 | | (e) The department and the participating public health |
---|
40 | 40 | | district shall: |
---|
41 | 41 | | (1) compile results submitted under Subsection (d) of |
---|
42 | 42 | | this section in order to track: |
---|
43 | 43 | | (A) the prevalence of diabetes mellitus among |
---|
44 | 44 | | people tested in the district; |
---|
45 | 45 | | (B) the level of diabetic control for the |
---|
46 | 46 | | patients with diabetes mellitus in each demographic group [exert |
---|
47 | 47 | | over the diabetes mellitus]; |
---|
48 | 48 | | (C) the trends of new diagnoses of diabetes |
---|
49 | 49 | | mellitus in the district; and |
---|
50 | 50 | | (D) the health care costs associated with |
---|
51 | 51 | | diabetes mellitus and glycosylated hemoglobin testing; and |
---|
52 | 52 | | (2) promote discussion and public information |
---|
53 | 53 | | programs regarding diabetes mellitus. |
---|
54 | 54 | | (g) Not later than October 1, 2009, the department shall |
---|
55 | 55 | | develop and make available on its Internet website the form |
---|
56 | 56 | | required under Subsection (d-1). |
---|
57 | 57 | | SECTION 2. Section 2, Chapter 706 (H.B. 2132), Acts of the |
---|
58 | 58 | | 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is amended to read as |
---|
59 | 59 | | follows: |
---|
60 | 60 | | Sec. 2. RULES. The executive commissioner of the Health and |
---|
61 | 61 | | Human Services Commission shall adopt rules to implement Section 1 |
---|
62 | 62 | | of this Act, including rules to govern the format and method of |
---|
63 | 63 | | collecting glycosylated hemoglobin data and patient diagnosis |
---|
64 | 64 | | codes. |
---|
65 | 65 | | SECTION 3. Section 4, Chapter 706 (H.B. 2132), Acts of the |
---|
66 | 66 | | 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is amended to read as |
---|
67 | 67 | | follows: |
---|
68 | 68 | | Sec. 4. REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2010 [2009], the |
---|
69 | 69 | | Department of State Health Services shall submit a report to the |
---|
70 | 70 | | governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of |
---|
71 | 71 | | representatives, and appropriate standing committees of the |
---|
72 | 72 | | legislature regarding the diabetes mellitus registry pilot program |
---|
73 | 73 | | that includes: |
---|
74 | 74 | | (1) an evaluation of the effectiveness of the pilot |
---|
75 | 75 | | program; and |
---|
76 | 76 | | (2) a recommendation to continue, expand, or eliminate |
---|
77 | 77 | | the pilot program. |
---|
78 | 78 | | SECTION 4. Section 5, Chapter 706 (H.B. 2132), Acts of the |
---|
79 | 79 | | 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is amended to read as |
---|
80 | 80 | | follows: |
---|
81 | 81 | | Sec. 5. EXPIRATION. This Act expires September 1, 2011 |
---|
82 | 82 | | [2010]. |
---|
83 | 83 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
84 | 84 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
85 | 85 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
86 | 86 | | I certify that H.B. No. 1363 was passed by the House on April |
---|
87 | 87 | | 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
88 | 88 | | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
89 | 89 | | No. 1363 on May 18, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 128, Nays 14, |
---|
90 | 90 | | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
91 | 91 | | ______________________________ |
---|
92 | 92 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
93 | 93 | | I certify that H.B. No. 1363 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
94 | 94 | | amendments, on May 14, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
95 | 95 | | 0. |
---|
96 | 96 | | ______________________________ |
---|
97 | 97 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
98 | 98 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
99 | 99 | | Date |
---|
100 | 100 | | __________________ |
---|
101 | 101 | | Governor |
---|