Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1363 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 1363


 AN ACT
 relating to the diabetes mellitus registry pilot program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 1, Chapter 706 (H.B. 2132), Acts of the
 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is amended by amending
 Subsections (c), (d), and (e) and adding Subsections (d-1) and (g)
 to read as follows:
 (c) The department shall select to participate in the pilot
 program a public health district that serves a county with a
 population of less than two million and contains a municipality
 with a population of over one million. The department and the
 public health district shall create an electronic registry to track
 the glycosylated hemoglobin level and the diagnosis codes of each
 person who has a laboratory test to determine that level performed
 at a clinical laboratory in the district.
 (d) Except as provided by Subsection (d-1), a physician
 practicing in the participating public health district who, on or
 after November 1, 2009, orders a glycosylated hemoglobin test for a
 patient shall submit to the clinical laboratory the diagnosis codes
 of a patient along with the patient's sample. A clinical laboratory
 located in the participating public health district shall submit to
 the district and the department for a patient whose diagnosis codes
 were submitted with the patient's sample the results of the
 patient's [each] glycosylated hemoglobin test along with the
 diagnosis codes provided by the physician for that patient [that
 the laboratory performs].
 (d-1)  A physician who orders a glycosylated hemoglobin test
 for a patient must provide the patient with a form developed by the
 department that allows the patient to opt out of having the
 patient's information included in the registry. If the patient
 opts out by signing the form, the physician:
 (1)  shall keep the form in the patient's medical
 records; and
 (2)  may not submit to the clinical laboratory the
 patient's diagnosis codes along with the patient's sample.
 (e) The department and the participating public health
 district shall:
 (1) compile results submitted under Subsection (d) of
 this section in order to track:
 (A) the prevalence of diabetes mellitus among
 people tested in the district;
 (B) the level of diabetic control for the
 patients with diabetes mellitus in each demographic group [exert
 over the diabetes mellitus];
 (C) the trends of new diagnoses of diabetes
 mellitus in the district; and
 (D) the health care costs associated with
 diabetes mellitus and glycosylated hemoglobin testing; and
 (2) promote discussion and public information
 programs regarding diabetes mellitus.
 (g)  Not later than October 1, 2009, the department shall
 develop and make available on its Internet website the form
 required under Subsection (d-1).
 SECTION 2. Section 2, Chapter 706 (H.B. 2132), Acts of the
 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 2. RULES. The executive commissioner of the Health and
 Human Services Commission shall adopt rules to implement Section 1
 of this Act, including rules to govern the format and method of
 collecting glycosylated hemoglobin data and patient diagnosis
 codes.
 SECTION 3. Section 4, Chapter 706 (H.B. 2132), Acts of the
 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 4. REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2010 [2009], the
 Department of State Health Services shall submit a report to the
 governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of
 representatives, and appropriate standing committees of the
 legislature regarding the diabetes mellitus registry pilot program
 that includes:
 (1) an evaluation of the effectiveness of the pilot
 program; and
 (2) a recommendation to continue, expand, or eliminate
 the pilot program.
 SECTION 4. Section 5, Chapter 706 (H.B. 2132), Acts of the
 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 5. EXPIRATION. This Act expires September 1, 2011
 [2010].
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1363 was passed by the House on April
 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1363 on May 18, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 128, Nays 14,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1363 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 14, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor