E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
05/27/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5217
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3354
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4991
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5163
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2894
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4500
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4501
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1092
|
Journal Page: 4500
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4500
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4304
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2625
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2625
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2625
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2625
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2625
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2625
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2625
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2009
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#307
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1828
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1811
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1811
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1236
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 490
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 490
|
House
|
02/17/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|