Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2179
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2179
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3042
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2701
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#630
|
Journal Page: 2700
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2700
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Orr
|
Journal Page: 2700
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2700
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2647
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2647
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 494
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 494
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|