Senate | 05/06/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 2092 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2092 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1949 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2434 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2273 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Record vote | RV#477 | Journal Page: 2272 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2272 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2272 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2235 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2235 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Amended | 2-Kleinschmidt | Journal Page: 2235 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2235 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1207 | |
House | 03/30/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 498 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 498 | |
House | 02/19/2009 | Filed |