E | 05/12/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/12/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3441 | |
E | 04/30/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2300 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1760 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2133 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2217 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1927 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1622 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1622 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1622 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1622 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1622 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1622 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1622 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1415 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 925 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1149 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1103 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Record vote | RV#119 | Journal Page: 1102 |
House | 04/07/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1102 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1102 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1078 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Amended | 1-Callegari | Journal Page: 1078 |
House | 04/06/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1078 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1014 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 499 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 499 | |
House | 02/19/2009 | Filed |