E | 05/23/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 05/23/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4641 | |
E | 05/15/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3954 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2411 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3716 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3954 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3298 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2245 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2245 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2245 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2245 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2245 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2245 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2245 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2193 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1658 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1658 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 743 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 989 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Record vote | RV#63 | Journal Page: 937 |
House | 03/26/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 937 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 937 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 932 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 932 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 728 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 501 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 501 | |
House | 02/19/2009 | Filed |