Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2223
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2223
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2198
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2989
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#685
|
Journal Page: 2988
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2988
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2988
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2736
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2736
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Gutierrez
|
Journal Page: 2736
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2736
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2009
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 278
|
House
|
02/12/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 278
|
House
|
11/10/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|