Senate | 05/07/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 2136 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2136 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1718 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2217 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Record vote | RV#335 | Journal Page: 1949 |
House | 04/28/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1949 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1949 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1936 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Amended | 1-Ortiz | Journal Page: 1936 |
House | 04/28/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1935 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 504 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 504 | |
House | 02/20/2009 | Filed |