E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
05/26/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5164
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2897
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4640
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4218
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2599
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2599
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2599
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2599
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2599
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2599
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2599
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2570
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2307
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1994
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1994
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1718
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#335
|
Journal Page: 1949
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1949
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1949
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1719
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 505
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 505
|
House
|
02/20/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|