E | 05/27/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 05/27/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5217 | |
E | 05/19/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4221 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2534 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3970 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4079 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3675 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2362 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2362 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2362 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2362 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2362 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2362 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2362 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2049 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1481 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1481 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1376 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1772 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1705 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Record vote | RV#241 | Journal Page: 1704 |
House | 04/22/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1704 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1704 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1643 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Amended | 1-Guillen | Journal Page: 1641 |
House | 04/21/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1641 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1123 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 506 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 506 | |
House | 02/20/2009 | Filed |