Senate | 04/24/2009 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 1480 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1480 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 995 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1207 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Record vote | RV#144 | Journal Page: 1172 |
House | 04/09/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1172 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1172 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1163 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1163 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1092 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/12/2009 | Referred to Technology, Economic Development & Workforce | Journal Page: 279 | |
House | 02/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 279 | |
House | 11/10/2008 | Filed |