House | 05/14/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1570 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2009 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 524 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 524 | |
House | 02/23/2009 | Filed |