Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2390
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2390
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2312
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3247
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#777
|
Journal Page: 3247
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3247
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Villarreal
|
Journal Page: 3246
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3246
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/12/09 3:50 PM
|
Journal Page: 3229
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3228
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3157
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#742
|
Journal Page: 3156
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3156
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
3-P. King
|
Journal Page: 3156
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Amendment tabled
|
2-P. King
|
Journal Page: 3155
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 3154
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Anchia
|
Journal Page: 3154
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3154
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2336
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2244
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2244
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 2235
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2235
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2235
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 526
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 526
|
House
|
02/23/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|