Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 3165
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Tagged
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2610
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2610
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2398
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3802
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3500
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#842
|
Journal Page: 3499
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3499
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3499
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3410
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#818
|
Journal Page: 3410
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3410
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Amendment tabled
|
2-P. King
|
Journal Page: 3408
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 3408
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
2-P. King
|
Journal Page: 3407
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32
|
Journal Page: 3406
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 3406
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/13/09 2:45 PM
|
Journal Page: 3353
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 11 and Rule 4, Section 14
|
Journal Page: 3352
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3351
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 526
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 526
|
House
|
02/23/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|