Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1680 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Gallego (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 1680
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2009;
 May 4, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 25, 2009, reported adversely,
 with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; May 25, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1680 By: Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an application filed with a county commissioners court
 to revise a subdivision plat.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 232.041, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  The commissioners court may impose a fee for an
 application under this section. The amount of the fee must be based
 on the cost of processing the application, including the notices
 required under Subsection (b) not to exceed one thousand five
 hundred dollars ($1,500.00).
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act to Section
 232.041, Local Government Code, applies only to an application
 filed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *