E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
05/26/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5164
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2913
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4569
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4305
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2625
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2625
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2625
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2625
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2625
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2625
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2625
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2358
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1376
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#243
|
Journal Page: 1706
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1706
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1706
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1643
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Hochberg
|
Journal Page: 1643
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1643
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 531
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 531
|
House
|
02/24/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|