House | 05/05/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2478 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1071 | Journal Page: 2478 |
House | 04/28/2009 | Postponed | 5/5/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1993 |
House | 04/28/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1993 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Postponed | 4/28/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1810 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1810 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1275 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 531 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 531 | |
House | 02/24/2009 | Filed |