E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4986
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6027
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6903
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4195
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4195
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5189
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5190
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1383
|
Journal Page: 5189
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5189
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
House discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5189
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4399
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4399
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4399
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4218
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2593
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2593
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2193
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2009
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1841
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#302
|
Journal Page: 1840
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1840
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1840
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1828
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1808
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1808
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Amended
|
2-S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 1808
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1807
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1014
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Referred to Corrections
|
|
Journal Page: 531
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 531
|
House
|
02/24/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|