E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6900
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5005
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5005
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1074
|
Journal Page: 5004
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6170
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6168
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2922
|
Journal Page: 6167
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4819
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5981
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5981
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4191
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4191
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4740
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4740
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4740
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4352
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2735
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2735
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2735
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2735
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2735
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2735
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2734
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2725
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1068
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#151
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1215
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1215
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1123
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 532
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 532
|
House
|
02/24/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|