Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1722 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 1722


 AN ACT
 relating to the proceedings that may be referred to and the powers
 of a criminal law magistrate in Bexar County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 54.906, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (a) A judge may refer to a magistrate any criminal case for
 proceedings involving:
 (1) a bond forfeiture;
 (2) a pretrial motion;
 (3) a postconviction writ of habeas corpus;
 (4) an examining trial;
 (5) the issuance of search warrants, including a
 search warrant under Article 18.02(10), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 notwithstanding Article 18.01(c), Code of Criminal Procedure;
 (6) the setting of bonds;
 (7) the arraignment of defendants; and
 (8) any other matter the judge considers necessary and
 proper, including a negotiated plea of guilty before the court.
 (c)  Subsection (a)(5) does not apply to the issuance of a
 subsequent search warrant under Article 18.02(10), Code of Criminal
 Procedure.
 SECTION 2. Section 54.908, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 54.908. POWERS. (a) Except as limited by an order of
 referral, a magistrate to whom a case is referred may:
 (1) conduct hearings;
 (2) hear evidence;
 (3) compel production of relevant evidence;
 (4) rule on admissibility of evidence;
 (5) issue summons for the appearance of witnesses;
 (6) examine witnesses;
 (7) swear witnesses for hearings;
 (8) make findings of fact on evidence;
 (9) formulate conclusions of law;
 (10) rule on a pretrial motion;
 (11) recommend the rulings, orders, or judgment to be
 made in a case;
 (12) regulate proceedings in a hearing;
 (13) accept a plea of guilty for a misdemeanor from a
 defendant charged with both misdemeanor and felony offenses; [and]
 (14) notwithstanding Article 18.01(c), Code of
 Criminal Procedure, issue a search warrant under Article 18.02(10),
 Code of Criminal Procedure; and
 (15) do any act and take any measure necessary and
 proper for the efficient performance of the duties required by the
 order of referral.
 (b)  A magistrate does not have authority under Subsection
 (a)(14) to issue a subsequent search warrant under Article
 18.02(10), Code of Criminal Procedure.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1722 was passed by the House on April
 15, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 1722 on May 25, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 1722 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1722 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 1722 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor