Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2092
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2092
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1879
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2337
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#412
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2009
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 533
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 533
|
House
|
02/24/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|