Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1727 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Smith of Harris, Lucio III H.B. No. 1727
 (Senate Sponsor - Nichols)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 23, 2009, reported favorably by
 the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the transport of fireworks within a municipality.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 342, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter Z to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER Z. MISCELLANEOUS PROVISIONS
 Sec. 342.901.  TRANSPORT OF FIREWORKS. The transport of
 fireworks in unopened and original packaging may not be prohibited
 or regulated.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *