E | 05/23/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/23/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4641 | |
E | 05/18/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4079 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2492 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3947 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4079 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2366 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3437 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2327 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2327 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2327 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2326 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2326 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2326 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2326 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2139 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1933 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1933 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1303 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Record vote | RV#211 | Journal Page: 1619 |
House | 04/21/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1619 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1619 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1583 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1583 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1148 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2009 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 533 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 533 | |
House | 02/24/2009 | Filed |