House | 05/11/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3160 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Record vote | RV#743 | Journal Page: 3159 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 3159 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Amended | 2-Taylor | Journal Page: 3159 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Amendment tabled | 1-Solomons and Pickett | Journal Page: 3159 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 3159 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) | Rule 11, Section 2 | Journal Page: 3159 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-Solomons and Pickett | Journal Page: 3158 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3158 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2594 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2336 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/04/2009 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 549 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 549 | |
House | 02/25/2009 | Filed |