House | 04/27/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1862 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2009 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 550 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 550 | |
House | 02/25/2009 | Filed |