E
|
04/29/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
04/29/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
E
|
04/22/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1304
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1660
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1260
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1260
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1260
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1260
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1259
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1259
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1259
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1012
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 920
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 911
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 911
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 826
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1034
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#75
|
Journal Page: 1000
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1000
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1000
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 995
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 995
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 969
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 566
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 566
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|