House | 05/04/2009 | Postponed | 12/25/10 12:01 AM | Journal Page: 2393 |
House | 05/04/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2393 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Postponed | 5/4/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2290 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 2290 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2278 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Record vote | RV#480 | Journal Page: 2277 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Failed to pass | Journal Page: 2277 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2277 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2236 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2236 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Amended | 1-Christian | Journal Page: 2236 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2236 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/03/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1093 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2009 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 567 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 567 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Filed |