E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4986
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6027
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6903
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4195
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5191
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1384
|
Journal Page: 5191
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5191
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4312
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2683
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2683
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2683
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2683
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2683
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2682
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2682
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Duncan
|
Journal Page: 2682
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2682
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2682
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2568
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1145
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1602
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1281
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#169
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1261
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Eiland
|
Journal Page: 1259
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1259
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 567
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 567
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|