Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1888 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 1888


 AN ACT
 relating to standards required for certain rankings of physicians
 by health benefit plans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subtitle F, Title 8, Insurance Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 1460 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 1460. STANDARDS REQUIRED REGARDING CERTAIN PHYSICIAN
 RANKINGS BY HEALTH BENEFIT PLANS
 Sec. 1460.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Health benefit plan issuer" means an entity
 authorized under this code or another insurance law of this state
 that provides health insurance or health benefits in this state,
 including:
 (A) an insurance company;
 (B)  a group hospital service corporation
 operating under Chapter 842;
 (C)  a health maintenance organization operating
 under Chapter 843; and
 (D)  a stipulated premium company operating under
 Chapter 884.
 (2)  "Physician" means an individual licensed to
 practice medicine in this state or another state of the United
 States.
 Sec. 1460.002. EXEMPTION. This chapter does not apply to:
 (1)  a Medicaid managed care program operated under
 Chapter 533, Government Code;
 (2)  a Medicaid program operated under Chapter 32,
 Human Resources Code;
 (3)  the child health plan program under Chapter 62,
 Health and Safety Code, or the health benefits plan for children
 under Chapter 63, Health and Safety Code; or
 (4)  a Medicare supplement benefit plan, as defined by
 Chapter 1652.
 Sec. 1460.003.  PHYSICIAN RANKING REQUIREMENTS. (a) A
 health benefit plan issuer, including a subsidiary or affiliate,
 may not rank physicians, classify physicians into tiers based on
 performance, or publish physician-specific information that
 includes rankings, tiers, ratings, or other comparisons of a
 physician's performance against standards, measures, or other
 physicians, unless:
 (1)  the standards used by the health benefit plan
 issuer conform to nationally recognized standards and guidelines as
 required by rules adopted under Section 1460.005;
 (2)  the standards and measurements to be used by the
 health benefit plan issuer are disclosed to each affected physician
 before any evaluation period used by the health benefit plan
 issuer; and
 (3)  each affected physician is afforded, before any
 publication or other public dissemination, an opportunity to
 dispute the ranking or classification through a process that, at a
 minimum, includes due process protections that conform to the
 following protections:
 (A)  the health benefit plan issuer provides at
 least 45 days' written notice to the physician of the proposed
 rating, ranking, tiering, or comparison, including the
 methodologies, data, and all other information utilized by the
 health benefit plan issuer in its rating, tiering, ranking, or
 comparison decision;
 (B)  in addition to any written fair
 reconsideration process, the health benefit plan issuer, upon a
 request for review that is made within 30 days of receiving the
 notice under Paragraph (A), provides a fair reconsideration
 proceeding, at the physician's option:
 (i)  by teleconference, at an agreed upon
 time; or
 (ii)  in person, at an agreed upon time or
 between the hours of 8:00 a.m. and 5:00 p.m. Monday through Friday;
 (C)  the physician has the right to provide
 information at a requested fair reconsideration proceeding for
 determination by a decision-maker, have a representative
 participate in the fair reconsideration proceeding, and submit a
 written statement at the conclusion of the fair reconsideration
 proceeding; and
 (D)  the health benefit plan issuer provides a
 written communication of the outcome of a fair reconsideration
 proceeding prior to any publication or dissemination of the rating,
 ranking, tiering, or comparison. The written communication must
 include the specific reasons for the final decision.
 (b)  This section does not apply to the publication of a list
 of network physicians and providers if ratings or comparisons are
 not made and the list is not a product of nor reflects the tiering or
 classification of physicians or providers.
 Sec. 1460.004.  DUTIES OF PHYSICIANS. A physician may not
 require or request that a patient of the physician enter into an
 agreement under which the patient agrees not to:
 (1) rank or otherwise evaluate the physician;
 (2) participate in surveys regarding the physician; or
 (3)  in any way comment on the patient's opinion of the
 physician.
 Sec. 1460.005.  RULES; STANDARDS. (a) The commissioner
 shall adopt rules as necessary to implement this chapter.
 (b)  The commissioner shall adopt rules as necessary to
 ensure that a health benefit plan issuer that uses a physician
 ranking system complies with the standards and guidelines described
 by Subsection (c).
 (c)  In adopting rules under this section, the commissioner
 shall consider the standards, guidelines, and measures prescribed
 by nationally recognized organizations that establish or promote
 guidelines and performance measures emphasizing quality of health
 care, including the National Quality Forum and the AQA Alliance. If
 neither the National Quality Forum nor the AQA Alliance has
 established standards or guidelines regarding an issue, the
 commissioner shall consider the standards, guidelines, and
 measures prescribed by the National Committee on Quality Assurance
 and other similar national organizations. If neither the National
 Quality Forum, nor the AQA Alliance, nor other national
 organizations have established standards or guidelines regarding
 an issue, the commissioner shall consider standards, guidelines,
 and measures based on other bona fide nationally recognized
 guidelines, expert-based physician consensus quality standards, or
 leading objective clinical evidence and scholarship.
 Sec. 1460.006.  DUTIES OF HEALTH BENEFIT PLAN ISSUER. A
 health benefit plan issuer shall ensure that:
 (1)  physicians currently in clinical practice are
 actively involved in the development of the standards used under
 this chapter; and
 (2)  the measures and methodology used in the
 comparison programs described by Section 1460.003 are transparent
 and valid.
 Sec. 1460.007.  SANCTIONS; DISCIPLINARY ACTIONS. (a) A
 health benefit plan issuer that violates this chapter or a rule
 adopted under this chapter is subject to sanctions and disciplinary
 actions under Chapters 82 and 84.
 (b)  A violation of this chapter by a physician constitutes
 grounds for disciplinary action by the Texas Medical Board,
 including imposition of an administrative penalty.
 SECTION 2. (a) A health benefit plan issuer shall comply
 with Chapter 1460, Insurance Code, as added by this Act, not later
 than December 31, 2009.
 (b) A health benefit plan issuer is not subject to sanctions
 or disciplinary actions under Section 1460.007, Insurance Code, as
 added by this Act, before January 1, 2010.
 (c) A physician is not subject to sanctions or disciplinary
 actions under Section 1460.007, Insurance Code, as added by this
 Act, before January 1, 2010.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1888 was passed by the House on April
 17, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1888 on May 28, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1888 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor