1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 19 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to requirements for drugs dispensed by pharmacists. |
---|
6 | 6 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 7 | | SECTION 1. Section 562.006, Occupations Code, is amended by |
---|
8 | 8 | | adding Subsections (a-1), (a-2), and (a-3) to read as follows: |
---|
9 | 9 | | (a-1) In addition to the information required by Subsection |
---|
10 | 10 | | (a), the label on the dispensing container of a drug dispensed by a |
---|
11 | 11 | | Class A or Class E pharmacy must indicate: |
---|
12 | 12 | | (1) the name, address, and telephone number of the |
---|
13 | 13 | | pharmacy; |
---|
14 | 14 | | (2) the date the prescription is dispensed; |
---|
15 | 15 | | (3) the name of the prescribing practitioner; |
---|
16 | 16 | | (4) the name of the patient or, if the drug was |
---|
17 | 17 | | prescribed for an animal, the species of the animal and the name of |
---|
18 | 18 | | the owner; |
---|
19 | 19 | | (5) instructions for use; |
---|
20 | 20 | | (6) the quantity dispensed; |
---|
21 | 21 | | (7) if the drug is dispensed in a container other than |
---|
22 | 22 | | the manufacturer's original container, the date after which the |
---|
23 | 23 | | prescription should not be used, determined according to criteria |
---|
24 | 24 | | established by board rule based on standards in the United States |
---|
25 | 25 | | Pharmacopeia-National Formulary; and |
---|
26 | 26 | | (8) any other information required by board rule. |
---|
27 | 27 | | (a-2) The information required by Subsection (a-1)(7) may |
---|
28 | 28 | | be recorded on any label affixed to the dispensing container. |
---|
29 | 29 | | (a-3) Subsection (a-1) does not apply to a prescription |
---|
30 | 30 | | dispensed to a person at the time of release from prison or jail if |
---|
31 | 31 | | the prescription is for not more than a 10-day supply of medication. |
---|
32 | 32 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 562, Occupations Code, is |
---|
33 | 33 | | amended by adding Section 562.0062 to read as follows: |
---|
34 | 34 | | Sec. 562.0062. REQUIRED STATEMENT REGARDING MEDICATION |
---|
35 | 35 | | DISPOSAL. The board by rule shall require pharmacists, when |
---|
36 | 36 | | dispensing certain drugs, to include on the dispensing container |
---|
37 | 37 | | label or in the information required by Section 562.0061 the |
---|
38 | 38 | | statement "Do not flush unused medications or pour down a sink or |
---|
39 | 39 | | drain." |
---|
40 | 40 | | SECTION 3. Not later than January 1, 2010, the Texas State |
---|
41 | 41 | | Board of Pharmacy shall adopt any rules necessary to implement |
---|
42 | 42 | | Section 562.006(a-1), Occupations Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
43 | 43 | | SECTION 4. Not later than June 1, 2010, the Texas State |
---|
44 | 44 | | Board of Pharmacy shall adopt rules under Section 562.0062, |
---|
45 | 45 | | Occupations Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
46 | 46 | | SECTION 5. Sections 562.006(a-1) and 562.0062, Occupations |
---|
47 | 47 | | Code, as added by this Act, apply only to a drug dispensed on or |
---|
48 | 48 | | after July 1, 2010. |
---|
49 | 49 | | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
50 | 50 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
51 | 51 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
52 | 52 | | I certify that H.B. No. 19 was passed by the House on April 8, |
---|
53 | 53 | | 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 1, 1 present, not |
---|
54 | 54 | | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
55 | 55 | | No. 19 on May 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 1, 1 |
---|
56 | 56 | | present, not voting. |
---|
57 | 57 | | ______________________________ |
---|
58 | 58 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
59 | 59 | | I certify that H.B. No. 19 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
60 | 60 | | amendments, on May 21, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
61 | 61 | | 0. |
---|
62 | 62 | | ______________________________ |
---|
63 | 63 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
64 | 64 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
65 | 65 | | Date |
---|
66 | 66 | | __________________ |
---|
67 | 67 | | Governor |
---|