Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB19 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 19


 AN ACT
 relating to requirements for drugs dispensed by pharmacists.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 562.006, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (a-1), (a-2), and (a-3) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  In addition to the information required by Subsection
 (a), the label on the dispensing container of a drug dispensed by a
 Class A or Class E pharmacy must indicate:
 (1)  the name, address, and telephone number of the
 pharmacy;
 (2) the date the prescription is dispensed;
 (3) the name of the prescribing practitioner;
 (4)  the name of the patient or, if the drug was
 prescribed for an animal, the species of the animal and the name of
 the owner;
 (5) instructions for use;
 (6) the quantity dispensed;
 (7)  if the drug is dispensed in a container other than
 the manufacturer's original container, the date after which the
 prescription should not be used, determined according to criteria
 established by board rule based on standards in the United States
 Pharmacopeia-National Formulary; and
 (8) any other information required by board rule.
 (a-2)  The information required by Subsection (a-1)(7) may
 be recorded on any label affixed to the dispensing container.
 (a-3)  Subsection (a-1) does not apply to a prescription
 dispensed to a person at the time of release from prison or jail if
 the prescription is for not more than a 10-day supply of medication.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 562, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 562.0062 to read as follows:
 Sec. 562.0062.  REQUIRED STATEMENT REGARDING MEDICATION
 DISPOSAL. The board by rule shall require pharmacists, when
 dispensing certain drugs, to include on the dispensing container
 label or in the information required by Section 562.0061 the
 statement "Do not flush unused medications or pour down a sink or
 drain."
 SECTION 3. Not later than January 1, 2010, the Texas State
 Board of Pharmacy shall adopt any rules necessary to implement
 Section 562.006(a-1), Occupations Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4. Not later than June 1, 2010, the Texas State
 Board of Pharmacy shall adopt rules under Section 562.0062,
 Occupations Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 5. Sections 562.006(a-1) and 562.0062, Occupations
 Code, as added by this Act, apply only to a drug dispensed on or
 after July 1, 2010.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 19 was passed by the House on April 8,
 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 1, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 19 on May 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 1, 1
 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 19 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor