Senate | 05/08/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 2180 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2180 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2104 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2871 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2573 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Record vote | RV#586 | Journal Page: 2572 |
House | 05/06/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2572 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2572 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2497 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2497 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2497 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1236 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2009 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 568 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 568 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Filed |