Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1924 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 H.B. No. 1924
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to the performance of pharmacy services in certain rural
66 areas.
77 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
88 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 562, Occupations Code, is
99 amended by adding Section 562.1011 to read as follows:
1010 Sec. 562.1011. OPERATION OF CLASS C PHARMACY IN CERTAIN
1111 RURAL HOSPITALS. (a) In this section:
1212 (1) "Nurse" has the meaning assigned by Section
1313 301.002. The term includes a nurse who is also registered as a
1414 pharmacy technician.
1515 (2) "Rural hospital" means a licensed hospital with 75
1616 beds or fewer that:
1717 (A) is located in a county with a population of
1818 50,000 or less; or
1919 (B) has been designated by the Centers for
2020 Medicare and Medicaid Services as a critical access hospital, rural
2121 referral center, or sole community hospital.
2222 (b) If a practitioner orders a prescription drug or device
2323 for a patient in a rural hospital when the hospital pharmacist is
2424 not on duty or when the institutional pharmacy is closed, a nurse or
2525 practitioner may withdraw the drug or device from the pharmacy in
2626 sufficient quantity to fill the order.
2727 (c) The hospital pharmacist shall verify the withdrawal of a
2828 drug or device under Subsection (b) and perform a drug regimen
2929 review not later than the seventh day after the date of the
3030 withdrawal.
3131 (d) In a rural hospital that uses a floor stock method of
3232 drug distribution, a nurse or practitioner may withdraw a
3333 prescription drug or device from the institutional pharmacy in the
3434 original manufacturer's container or a prepackaged container.
3535 (e) The hospital pharmacist shall verify the withdrawal of a
3636 drug or device under Subsection (d) and perform a drug regimen
3737 review not later than the seventh day after the date of the
3838 withdrawal.
3939 (f) A rural hospital may allow a pharmacy technician to
4040 perform the duties specified in Subsection (g) if:
4141 (1) the pharmacy technician is registered and meets
4242 the training requirements specified by the board;
4343 (2) a pharmacist is accessible at all times to respond
4444 to any questions and needs of the pharmacy technician or other
4545 hospital employees, by telephone, answering or paging service,
4646 e-mail, or any other system that makes a pharmacist accessible; and
4747 (3) a nurse or practitioner or a pharmacist by remote
4848 access verifies the accuracy of the actions of the pharmacy
4949 technician.
5050 (g) If the requirements of Subsection (f) are met, the
5151 pharmacy technician may, during the hours that the institutional
5252 pharmacy in the hospital is open, perform the following duties in
5353 the pharmacy without the direct supervision of a pharmacist:
5454 (1) enter medication order and drug distribution
5555 information into a data processing system;
5656 (2) prepare, package, or label a prescription drug
5757 according to a medication order if a licensed nurse or practitioner
5858 verifies the accuracy of the order before administration of the
5959 drug to the patient;
6060 (3) fill a medication cart used in the rural hospital;
6161 (4) distribute routine orders for stock supplies to
6262 patient care areas;
6363 (5) access and restock automated medication supply
6464 cabinets; and
6565 (6) perform any other duty specified by the board by
6666 rule.
6767 (h) The pharmacist-in-charge of an institutional pharmacy
6868 in a rural hospital shall develop and implement policies and
6969 procedures for the operation of the pharmacy when a pharmacist is
7070 not on-site.
7171 (i) On or after September 1, 2011, the board may establish,
7272 by rule, a requirement for prospective and retrospective drug use
7373 review by a pharmacist for each new drug order. A drug use review is
7474 not required when a delay in administration of the drug would harm
7575 the patient in an urgent or emergency situation, including sudden
7676 changes in a patient's clinical status.
7777 (j) Rural hospitals may establish standing orders and
7878 protocols, to be developed jointly by the pharmacist and medical
7979 staff, that may include additional exceptions to instances in which
8080 prospective drug use review is required.
8181 (k) This section does not restrict or prohibit the board
8282 from adopting a rule related to authorizing the withdrawal of a drug
8383 or device by a nurse or practitioner from, or the supervision of a
8484 pharmacy technician in, an institutional pharmacy not located in a
8585 rural hospital. As part of the rulemaking process, the board shall
8686 consider the effect that a proposed rule, if adopted, would have on
8787 access to pharmacy services in hospitals that are not rural
8888 hospitals.
8989 (l) The board shall adopt rules to implement this section,
9090 including rules specifying:
9191 (1) the records that must be maintained under this
9292 section;
9393 (2) the requirements for policies and procedures for
9494 operation of a pharmacy when a pharmacist is not on-site; and
9595 (3) the training requirements for pharmacy
9696 technicians.
9797 SECTION 2. Chapter 568, Occupations Code, is amended by
9898 adding Section 568.008 to read as follows:
9999 Sec. 568.008. TECHNICIANS IN HOSPITALS WITH CLINICAL
100100 PHARMACY PROGRAM. (a) In this section, "clinical pharmacy program"
101101 means a program that provides pharmaceutical care services as
102102 specified by board rule.
103103 (b) A Class C pharmacy that has an ongoing clinical pharmacy
104104 program may allow a pharmacy technician to verify the accuracy of
105105 work performed by another pharmacy technician relating to the
106106 filling of floor stock and unit dose distribution systems for a
107107 patient admitted to the hospital if the patient's orders have
108108 previously been reviewed and approved by a pharmacist.
109109 (c) The pharmacist-in-charge of the clinical pharmacy
110110 program shall adopt policies and procedures for the verification
111111 process authorized by this section.
112112 (d) A hospital must notify the board before implementing the
113113 verification process authorized by this section.
114114 (e) The board shall adopt rules to implement this section,
115115 including rules specifying:
116116 (1) the duties that may be verified by another
117117 pharmacy technician;
118118 (2) the records that must be maintained for the
119119 verification process; and
120120 (3) the training requirements for pharmacy
121121 technicians who verify the accuracy of the work of other pharmacy
122122 technicians.
123123 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
124124 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
125125 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
126126 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
127127 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
128128 ______________________________ ______________________________
129129 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
130130 I certify that H.B. No. 1924 was passed by the House on April
131131 24, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, 1 present, not
132132 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
133133 H.B. No. 1924 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
134134 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
135135 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
136136 on H.B. No. 1924 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
137137 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
138138 ______________________________
139139 Chief Clerk of the House
140140 I certify that H.B. No. 1924 was passed by the Senate, with
141141 amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
142142 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
143143 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
144144 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
145145 1924 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
146146 ______________________________
147147 Secretary of the Senate
148148 APPROVED: __________________
149149 Date
150150 __________________
151151 Governor