Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1924 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 1924


 AN ACT
 relating to the performance of pharmacy services in certain rural
 areas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 562, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 562.1011 to read as follows:
 Sec. 562.1011.  OPERATION OF CLASS C PHARMACY IN CERTAIN
 RURAL HOSPITALS. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Nurse" has the meaning assigned by Section
 301.002. The term includes a nurse who is also registered as a
 pharmacy technician.
 (2)  "Rural hospital" means a licensed hospital with 75
 beds or fewer that:
 (A)  is located in a county with a population of
 50,000 or less; or
 (B)  has been designated by the Centers for
 Medicare and Medicaid Services as a critical access hospital, rural
 referral center, or sole community hospital.
 (b)  If a practitioner orders a prescription drug or device
 for a patient in a rural hospital when the hospital pharmacist is
 not on duty or when the institutional pharmacy is closed, a nurse or
 practitioner may withdraw the drug or device from the pharmacy in
 sufficient quantity to fill the order.
 (c)  The hospital pharmacist shall verify the withdrawal of a
 drug or device under Subsection (b) and perform a drug regimen
 review not later than the seventh day after the date of the
 withdrawal.
 (d)  In a rural hospital that uses a floor stock method of
 drug distribution, a nurse or practitioner may withdraw a
 prescription drug or device from the institutional pharmacy in the
 original manufacturer's container or a prepackaged container.
 (e)  The hospital pharmacist shall verify the withdrawal of a
 drug or device under Subsection (d) and perform a drug regimen
 review not later than the seventh day after the date of the
 withdrawal.
 (f)  A rural hospital may allow a pharmacy technician to
 perform the duties specified in Subsection (g) if:
 (1)  the pharmacy technician is registered and meets
 the training requirements specified by the board;
 (2)  a pharmacist is accessible at all times to respond
 to any questions and needs of the pharmacy technician or other
 hospital employees, by telephone, answering or paging service,
 e-mail, or any other system that makes a pharmacist accessible; and
 (3)  a nurse or practitioner or a pharmacist by remote
 access verifies the accuracy of the actions of the pharmacy
 technician.
 (g)  If the requirements of Subsection (f) are met, the
 pharmacy technician may, during the hours that the institutional
 pharmacy in the hospital is open, perform the following duties in
 the pharmacy without the direct supervision of a pharmacist:
 (1)  enter medication order and drug distribution
 information into a data processing system;
 (2)  prepare, package, or label a prescription drug
 according to a medication order if a licensed nurse or practitioner
 verifies the accuracy of the order before administration of the
 drug to the patient;
 (3) fill a medication cart used in the rural hospital;
 (4)  distribute routine orders for stock supplies to
 patient care areas;
 (5)  access and restock automated medication supply
 cabinets; and
 (6)  perform any other duty specified by the board by
 rule.
 (h)  The pharmacist-in-charge of an institutional pharmacy
 in a rural hospital shall develop and implement policies and
 procedures for the operation of the pharmacy when a pharmacist is
 not on-site.
 (i)  On or after September 1, 2011, the board may establish,
 by rule, a requirement for prospective and retrospective drug use
 review by a pharmacist for each new drug order. A drug use review is
 not required when a delay in administration of the drug would harm
 the patient in an urgent or emergency situation, including sudden
 changes in a patient's clinical status.
 (j)  Rural hospitals may establish standing orders and
 protocols, to be developed jointly by the pharmacist and medical
 staff, that may include additional exceptions to instances in which
 prospective drug use review is required.
 (k)  This section does not restrict or prohibit the board
 from adopting a rule related to authorizing the withdrawal of a drug
 or device by a nurse or practitioner from, or the supervision of a
 pharmacy technician in, an institutional pharmacy not located in a
 rural hospital. As part of the rulemaking process, the board shall
 consider the effect that a proposed rule, if adopted, would have on
 access to pharmacy services in hospitals that are not rural
 hospitals.
 (l)  The board shall adopt rules to implement this section,
 including rules specifying:
 (1)  the records that must be maintained under this
 section;
 (2)  the requirements for policies and procedures for
 operation of a pharmacy when a pharmacist is not on-site; and
 (3)  the training requirements for pharmacy
 technicians.
 SECTION 2. Chapter 568, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Section 568.008 to read as follows:
 Sec. 568.008.  TECHNICIANS IN HOSPITALS WITH CLINICAL
 PHARMACY PROGRAM. (a) In this section, "clinical pharmacy program"
 means a program that provides pharmaceutical care services as
 specified by board rule.
 (b)  A Class C pharmacy that has an ongoing clinical pharmacy
 program may allow a pharmacy technician to verify the accuracy of
 work performed by another pharmacy technician relating to the
 filling of floor stock and unit dose distribution systems for a
 patient admitted to the hospital if the patient's orders have
 previously been reviewed and approved by a pharmacist.
 (c)  The pharmacist-in-charge of the clinical pharmacy
 program shall adopt policies and procedures for the verification
 process authorized by this section.
 (d)  A hospital must notify the board before implementing the
 verification process authorized by this section.
 (e)  The board shall adopt rules to implement this section,
 including rules specifying:
 (1)  the duties that may be verified by another
 pharmacy technician;
 (2)  the records that must be maintained for the
 verification process; and
 (3)  the training requirements for pharmacy
 technicians who verify the accuracy of the work of other pharmacy
 technicians.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1924 was passed by the House on April
 24, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 1924 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 1924 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1924 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 1924 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor