Senate | 05/21/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 2686 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2686 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2367 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3679 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3327 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Record vote | RV#800 | Journal Page: 3327 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3327 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3327 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3283 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3283 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3283 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2009 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2009 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 570 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 570 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Filed |