House | 04/29/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 630 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 630 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 573 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 573 | |
House | 02/27/2009 | Filed |