Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1971 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R9834 YDB-F
 By: Hamilton H.B. No. 1971


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to regulation of fire protection sprinkler technicians.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 6003.001, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (1-a) and amending Subdivision (6) to read as
 follows:
 (1-a)  "Fire protection sprinkler technician" means a
 person who installs, alters, maintains, or services a fire
 protection sprinkler system or any part of the system as an employee
 of a fire protection sprinkler system contractor.
 (6) "License" means the document issued to a
 responsible managing employee or a fire protection sprinkler
 technician authorizing the employee or technician to engage in the
 fire protection sprinkler system business in this state.
 SECTION 2. Section 6003.052(b), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b) Under rules adopted under Section 6003.051(b), the
 department shall operate [may create] a specialized licensing or
 registration program for:
 (1) fire protection sprinkler system contractors; and
 (2) fire protection sprinkler technicians.
 SECTION 3. Section 6003.055, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (c) and adding Subsection (d) to read
 as follows:
 (a) The commissioner shall set the fee for:
 (1) a registration certificate application in an
 amount not to exceed $100;
 (2) an initial or renewal registration certificate in
 an amount not to exceed $1,200 annually; [and]
 (3) an initial or renewal responsible managing
 employee license fee in an amount not to exceed $200 annually; and
 (4)  a renewal fire protection sprinkler technician fee
 of $30.
 (c) Except as provided by Subsection (d), the [The]
 commissioner shall set a fee in an amount not to exceed $70 for:
 (1) a duplicate registration certificate or license
 issued under this chapter; or
 (2) any request requiring changes to a registration
 certificate or license.
 (d) The commissioner shall charge a fee of $30 for:
 (1)  a duplicate fire protection sprinkler technician
 license issued under this chapter; or
 (2)  any request requiring changes to a fire protection
 sprinkler technician license.
 SECTION 4. Subchapter D, Chapter 6003, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 6003.1535 to read as follows:
 Sec. 6003.1535.  FIRE PROTECTION SPRINKLER TECHNICIAN:
 LICENSE REQUIRED.  (a)  Each fire protection sprinkler system
 contractor must have at least one licensed fire protection
 sprinkler technician on each job site to perform the work of
 installing, altering, maintaining, or servicing a fire protection
 sprinkler system that requires a license under this chapter.
 (b)  A person may not install, alter, maintain, or service a
 fire protection sprinkler system unless the person:
 (1)  is licensed under this chapter or is working under
 the direct supervision of a person licensed under this chapter; and
 (2)  is performing the activity as an employee of a
 licensed fire protection sprinkler system contractor.
 (c)  The department shall issue a fire protection sprinkler
 technician license conditioned on the applicant's successful
 completion of the required examination. Each applicant for a fire
 protection sprinkler technician license must submit with the
 application:
 (1)  proof that the applicant holds certification
 issued by a certification organization in accordance with
 Subsection (e) or by another state with which this state has a
 reciprocity agreement in accordance with Subsection (f); and
 (2)  a nonrefundable application and examination fee of
 $30.
 (d)  Each applicant for a fire protection sprinkler
 technician's license is subject to a criminal history check under
 Section 411.106, Government Code.
 (e)  The department, in consultation with the state fire
 marshal, shall select to certify fire protection sprinkler
 technicians under this chapter a certification organization that:
 (1)  conducts certification of fire protection
 sprinkler system personnel who have successfully completed
 training administered by a certification program or institution
 recognized by the federal government in the installation of piping
 systems that serve for fire protection;
 (2)  makes certification decisions that are not subject
 to approval by any other organization or the membership of an
 affiliated organization and operates all financial matters related
 to the certification organization's operation separately from the
 affiliated organization;
 (3)  uses reliable testing mechanisms that are
 objective, fair, job-related, and based on the applicant's
 knowledge and skills necessary to function in the fire protection
 sprinkler industry;
 (4)  establishes scores for successful completion of
 certification at a level that protects the public by determining
 whether the applicant is sufficiently knowledgeable to install,
 repair, alter, maintain, and service fire protection sprinkler
 systems that meet applicable code standards; and
 (5)  publishes and makes available to the public the
 procedures used by the organization in examination construction and
 validation, the eligibility requirements and determination
 procedures, and the procedures for examination administration
 including dates, locations, fees, result reporting,
 recertification requirements, and grievance or appeals procedures.
 (f)  The state fire marshal may make an agreement, subject to
 approval by the governor, with another state to allow licensing by
 reciprocity.
 SECTION 5. Section 6003.156, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (a-1) and (f) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  The examination for a fire protection sprinkler
 technician must test the applicant's knowledge of the installation,
 repair, alteration, maintenance, and service of fire protection
 sprinkler systems, in accordance with nationally accepted code
 standards approved by the commissioner.
 (f)  A person who fails the examination for a fire protection
 sprinkler technician license may not retake the examination before
 the 90th day after the date of the initial examination and must
 submit a $30 nonrefundable examination fee for each subsequent
 attempt.
 SECTION 6. Section 6003.158, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (b) Except as provided by Subsection (c), participation
 [Participation] in the continuing education programs is voluntary.
 (c)  A fire protection sprinkler technician must annually
 complete at least eight hours of continuing education in accordance
 with commissioner rules.
 SECTION 7. Section 6003.201(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a) An [Except as otherwise provided by this subsection, an]
 initial registration certificate or license is valid for a period
 of two years [one year] from the date of issue and is renewable on
 payment of the renewal fee. [An initial registration certificate
 or license issued on or after September 1, 1983, may be issued for a
 period of less than one year and the renewal fee shall be prorated
 proportionally.]
 SECTION 8. The heading to Subchapter F, Chapter 6003,
 Insurance Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER F. PRACTICE, PROHIBITED PRACTICES, AND DISCIPLINARY
 PROCEDURES
 SECTION 9. Subchapter F, Chapter 6003, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 6003.2515 to read as follows:
 Sec. 6003.2515.  IDENTIFICATION CARD.  (a)  A fire
 protection sprinkler technician must carry an identification card
 issued by the department while the technician is performing a
 service for which licensing is required by this chapter and must
 present the card on request. The commissioner by rule shall
 prescribe the form and content of the card.
 (b)  The department shall provide the identification card on
 issuance of a fire protection sprinkler technician license or
 renewal license.
 SECTION 10. (a) Not later than January 1, 2010, the
 commissioner of insurance and the state fire marshal shall adopt
 the rules and establish the procedures and certification and
 examination requirements necessary to implement the licensing of
 fire protection sprinkler technicians under Chapter 6003,
 Insurance Code, as amended by this Act.
 (b) A fire protection sprinkler technician is not required
 to hold a license under Chapter 6003, Insurance Code, as amended by
 this Act, before July 1, 2010.
 SECTION 11. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.