House | 05/12/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3301 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2203 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 574 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 574 | |
House | 02/27/2009 | Filed |