Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1978 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R28091 JSC-D
 By: Farias, et al. H.B. No. 1978
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 1978:
 By: Rose C.S.H.B. No. 1978


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of an evidence-based youth
 development competitive grant pilot program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. DEFINITIONS. In this Act:
 (1) "Adolescent" means a person who is at least 12
 years of age but younger than 18 years of age.
 (2) "Department" means the Department of Family and
 Protective Services.
 SECTION 2. ESTABLISHMENT OF EVIDENCE-BASED YOUTH
 DEVELOPMENT COMPETITIVE GRANT PILOT PROGRAM. (a) The department
 shall establish an evidence-based youth development competitive
 grant pilot program to award grants for the implementation,
 expansion, and operation of evidence-based youth development
 programs designed to provide information and guidance for not more
 than a total of 75 adolescents in making healthy and beneficial life
 choices.
 (b) The pilot program shall be located in Bexar County and
 serve regions that are:
 (1) located in zip codes in which the school-age birth
 rate is at least three times the national school-age birth rate; and
 (2) served by one or more school districts in which:
 (A) at least 90 percent of the student population
 is economically disadvantaged; and
 (B) the annual dropout rate for grades 7 through
 12 is greater than five percent.
 SECTION 3. EVIDENCE-BASED YOUTH DEVELOPMENT PROGRAM
 REQUIREMENTS. (a) An evidence-based youth development program
 funded through a grant awarded under this Act must:
 (1) target adolescents who:
 (A) are at risk of becoming pregnant or causing
 an unplanned pregnancy or already have a child;
 (B) are at risk of engaging in delinquent conduct
 or conduct indicating a need for supervision, as those terms are
 defined by Section 51.03, Family Code;
 (C) are students at risk of dropping out of
 school as defined by Section 29.081(d), Education Code;
 (D) live in foster care or in a facility operated
 by the state; or
 (E) live in economically disadvantaged
 circumstances;
 (2) feature a curriculum that is appropriate for
 adolescents and that has been demonstrated to reduce school dropout
 and adolescent pregnancy rates;
 (3) include a community service component of not fewer
 than 20 hours;
 (4) include at least one activity session or group
 discussion each week; and
 (5) cover a wide variety of developmental topics of
 interest to adolescents, including:
 (A) development of values and good judgment;
 (B) communication and assertiveness;
 (C) healthy relationships;
 (D) influence of others and peer pressure;
 (E) goal-setting;
 (F) decision-making;
 (G) development and human sexuality;
 (H) preparation for participation in community
 service activities;
 (I) community service learning; and
 (J) group reflection on community service
 experiences.
 (b) An evidence-based youth development program that
 receives a grant under this Act must use grant funding to operate
 during a nine-month period beginning not earlier than August 1,
 2010, and not later than September 30, 2010.
 SECTION 4. APPLICATION. (a) A public or private entity,
 including a county, municipality, or other political subdivision of
 this state, may apply for a grant under this Act by submitting a
 written application to the department on a form prescribed by the
 department.
 (b) The application prescribed by the department must:
 (1) require the applicant to provide data on the
 number of adolescents who will receive assistance through the
 program;
 (2) describe the ongoing monitoring and evaluation
 process to which a grant recipient is subject, including the
 recipient's obligation to collect and provide information
 requested by the department; and
 (3) require the applicant to provide other relevant
 information as determined by the department.
 SECTION 5. ADDITIONAL CONSIDERATIONS IN AWARDING GRANTS.
 In determining whether to award a grant under this Act, the
 department shall consider:
 (1) the applicant's ability to:
 (A) participate in ongoing monitoring and
 performance evaluations, including the applicant's ability to
 collect and provide information required by the department;
 (B) adhere to the evidence-based youth
 development program operating and performance standards; and
 (C) develop broad-based community support for
 implementing or expanding an evidence-based youth development
 program, as applicable; and
 (2) the applicant's history of developing and
 sustaining innovative, high-quality programs that meet the needs of
 families and communities.
 SECTION 6. EVIDENCE-BASED YOUTH DEVELOPMENT PROGRAM
 STANDARDS. The commissioner of the department, in accordance with
 the goals and requirements established by this Act, shall adopt
 standards for an evidence-based youth development program awarded a
 grant under this Act.
 SECTION 7. USE OF AWARDED GRANT FUNDS. The grant funds
 awarded under this Act may be used only to cover costs related to
 implementing, expanding, or operating an evidence-based youth
 development program during a nine-month period beginning not
 earlier than August 1, 2010, and not later than September 30, 2010,
 including costs related to:
 (1) administering the program, including:
 (A) appropriate local site selection; and
 (B) required evaluation and quality monitoring;
 (2) training and managing staff;
 (3) paying staff salaries and expenses; and
 (4) paying for program facilities and equipment.
 SECTION 8. EVIDENCE-BASED YOUTH DEVELOPMENT PROGRAM
 MONITORING AND EVALUATION; COMMITTEE REPORT. (a) The commissioner
 of the department shall adopt performance indicators designed to
 measure a grant recipient's performance with respect to the
 evidence-based youth development program standards adopted by the
 commissioner under Section 6 of this Act.
 (b) The department shall use the performance indicators to
 monitor and evaluate the performance of each grant recipient.
 (c) Not later than November 1, 2011, the department shall
 submit a report to the Senate Health and Human Services Committee,
 or its successor, and the House Human Services Committee, or its
 successor, regarding the performance of each grant recipient with
 respect to providing evidence-based youth development program
 services, including:
 (1) the number of low-income adolescents served by an
 evidence-based youth development program and, of that number, the
 number of adolescents who subsequently became pregnant or caused a
 pregnancy; and
 (2) any other information required by the department.
 (d) On request, each grant recipient shall timely collect
 and provide data and any other information required by the
 department to monitor and evaluate the recipient or to prepare the
 report required by this section.
 SECTION 9. EVIDENCE-BASED YOUTH DEVELOPMENT COMPETITIVE
 GRANT PILOT PROGRAM FUNDING. (a) The department may actively seek
 and apply for any available federal funds or grants from any source
 to assist in financing the competitive grant pilot program
 established under this Act.
 (b) The department may use appropriated funds and may accept
 gifts, donations, and grants of money from the federal government,
 local governments, private corporations, or other persons to assist
 in financing the competitive grant pilot program.
 SECTION 10. EXPIRATION. This Act expires December 31,
 2011.
 SECTION 11. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 September 1, 2009.