E | 05/23/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/23/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4641 | |
E | 05/18/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4079 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2492 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3947 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4079 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3437 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2329 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2329 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2329 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2329 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2329 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2329 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2329 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2139 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 1657 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1657 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 995 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1207 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1175 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Record vote | RV#146 | Journal Page: 1175 |
House | 04/09/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1175 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1175 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1140 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Amended | 1-Aycock | Journal Page: 1139 |
House | 04/08/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1139 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 989 | |
House | 03/24/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 291 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 291 | |
House | 11/12/2008 | Filed |