H.B. No. 2055 AN ACT relating to the Chronic Kidney Disease Task Force. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 98.003, Health and Safety Code, as added by Chapter 671 (H.B. 1373), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 98.003. DUTIES. The task force shall: (1) develop a cost-effective plan for prevention, early screening, diagnosis, and management of [to educate health care professionals about the advantages and methods of early screening, diagnosis, and treatment of] chronic kidney disease for the state's population [and complications related to chronic kidney disease based on the Kidney Disease Outcomes Quality Initiative Clinical Practice Guidelines for Chronic Kidney Disease or other medically recognized clinical practice guidelines]; and (2) develop a plan for surveillance and data analysis to assess the impact of [to educate health care professionals and individuals with] chronic kidney disease [about the advantages of end-stage renal disease modality education and early renal replacement therapy, including in-center dialysis, home hemodialysis, peritoneal dialysis as well as other access options, and transplantation, before the onset of end-stage renal disease when kidney function is declining; and [(3) make recommendations on the implementation of a cost-effective plan for early screening, diagnosis, and treatment of chronic kidney disease for the state's population]. SECTION 2. Section 98.006, Health and Safety Code, as added by Chapter 671 (H.B. 1373), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 98.006. REPORT. Not later than January 1, 2011 [2009], the task force shall submit its findings and recommendations to: (1) the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of representatives; and (2) the presiding officers of the Senate Committee on Health and Human Services and the Public Health Committee of the house of representatives, or the appropriate committees of the 81st Legislature. SECTION 3. Section 98.009, Health and Safety Code, as added by Chapter 671 (H.B. 1373), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 98.009. EXPIRATION. The task force is abolished and this chapter expires on September 1, 2011 [2009]. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect August 31, 2009. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2055 was passed by the House on April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2055 was passed by the Senate on May 14, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: _____________________ Date _____________________ Governor