House | 04/08/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 591 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 591 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Filed |