Senate | 05/11/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2196 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 2043 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2043 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1950 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2434 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Record vote | RV#465 | Journal Page: 2264 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2264 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2264 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2231 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Amended | 1-Solomons | Journal Page: 2231 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2231 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1275 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 592 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 592 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Filed |