House | 05/11/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3302 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 592 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 592 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Filed |