E
|
05/20/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
05/20/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4316
|
E
|
05/12/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3441
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2197
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3171
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3039
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2179
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2179
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2179
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2179
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2178
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2178
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2178
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2096
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 997
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#144
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1166
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1166
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1072
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 593
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 593
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|